Financial history ASHMEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 285941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £11.35k £9.32k £7.07k £3.72k £3.86k
Total expenditure £2.07k £15.70k £5.65k £2.30k £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A