TOM AND SHEILA SPRINGER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust Fund shall be held for the relief of sickness by the acquisition and/or provision of life-saving equipment and for any other medical purpose as the Trustees in their absolute discretion from time to time direct
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 16 December 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Graham | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Baboo Kabra | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.73k | £202.26k | £271.47k | £290.21k | £269.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.82k | £219.28k | £197.20k | £266.74k | £246.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF LIFE SAVING EQUIPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Simpson Wreford Llp
Wellesley House
Duke of Wellington Avenue
LONDON
SE18 6SS
- Phone:
- 02083176460
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window