Financial history SOHAM AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 285967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £220.60k £162.48k £195.19k £234.83k £427.94k
Total expenditure £225.64k £139.85k £192.33k £228.41k £436.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.52k £93.72k £20.39k £33.17k £185.29k