SOHAM AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sport for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £185,289 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 December 1982: Standard registration
- ROSS PEERS SPORTS CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL EDWIN DAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geoff Fisher | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Phillip Lane | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.60k | £162.48k | £195.19k | £234.83k | £427.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.64k | £139.85k | £192.33k | £228.41k | £436.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.52k | £93.72k | £20.39k | £33.17k | £185.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 May 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, PHYSICAL EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN OR IN CONNECTION WITH SOHAM AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT, SUCH FACILITIES TO BE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OF SUCH SPECIAL FACILITIES ALL SUCH FACILITIES WHETHER FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR FOR ANY OR ALL OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED SPECIAL CLASSES TO BE PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NO DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROSS PEERS SPORTS CENTRE
COLLEGE CLOSE
SOHAM
ELY
CB7 5HP
- Phone:
- 01353722662
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window