THE SYLVAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Sylvan's healers is to bring relief and support to anyone in need via spiritual/energy healing and to provide training for those who wish to become healers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 December 1982: Standard registration
- SYLVAN HEALING SANCTUARY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG NIGEL REBUCK | Chair |
|
||||||
CHERYL VICKI JACOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY BERNSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65k | £16.41k | £10.37k | £13.25k | £12.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.24k | £9.87k | £7.78k | £8.80k | £15.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL BY SPIRITUAL HEALING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25a Oaklands Road
Totteridge
LONDON
N20 8AX
- Phone:
- 02084456369
- Email:
- cheryl.j@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window