Financial history BEDFORD PARK

Charity number: 286005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.60k £103.67k £102.34k £308.43k £108.44k
Total expenditure £89.60k £103.67k £102.34k £98.04k £129.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.89k £54.35k £45.15k £240.98k £21.65k