Accounts and annual returns THE CORNWALL HOLY TRINITY TRUST

Charity Number: 286014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not submitted