VICTIM SUPPORT BARNET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's principal activity is to relieve persons in the London Borough of Barnet (and the neighbourhood thereof) who are in conditions of need, hardship and distress or sickness, particularly those who are suffering or who have suffered as a result of crime, in such ways as the Committee of Management think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 19 January 1983: Standard registration
- 18 June 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 June 2009: Funds transferred to 298028 VICTIM SUPPORT
- VICTIM SUPPORT BARNET VICTIM SUPPORT IN LONDON-BARNET (Working name)
- BARNET VICTIMS SUPPORT SCHEME (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.53k | £124.49k | £123.89k | £124.79k | £127.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.08k | £126.71k | £126.69k | £124.04k | £127.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 04 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 24 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 25 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 05 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 05 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 14 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 14 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN BARNET (AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF CRIME, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window