THE BONE MARROW RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and support bone marrow research and its clinical application.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1983: Standard registration
- 17 April 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 April 2009: Funds transferred to 216032 Blood Cancer UK Research
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £10.41k | £5.06k | £5.93k | £5.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £13.53k | £27.36k | £6.78k | £6.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 02 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 April 2006 | 65 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 20 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE DIAGNOSIS CAUSATION AND MECHANISMS OF ALL DISEASES AND IN PARTICULAR BUTY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING DISEASES CONNECTED WITH BONE MARROW AND ITS RELATED CONDITIONS INCLUDING THE NORMAL STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION OF THE RELEVANT ORGANS AND TISSUES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH (INCLUDING RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION) AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. (B) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES (WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE) BEING CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window