Accounts and annual returns DODDINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 286034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 15 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 26 September 2008 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 26 September 2008 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2004 16 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required