BORSTAL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Borstal WI consist of mainly elderly members. The committee have committed themselves to the care and welfare of these members. We make sure they are aware of local amenities and encourage them to take part in environmental issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Medway
Governance
- 12 January 1983: Standard registration
- 28 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 17/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31k | £2.24k | £2.17k | £2.03k | £599 | |
|
Total expenditure | £961 | £2.15k | £1.96k | £2.35k | £1.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 April 2014 | 24 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 16 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window