ANIMAL RESCUE (NORFOLK GROUP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance to individuals and like minded animal welfare groups within Norfolk. Dealing with animal rescue and animal veterinary treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 December 1982: Standard registration
- ANIMAL RESCUE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BAYLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DIANNE HELEN HUNTER | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN SPINKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £936 | £2.34k | £1.17k | £1.42k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £785 | £1.61k | £1.62k | £775 | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1641 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1641 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO CARE FOR AND PROTECT ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF THEIR ABANDONMENT, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR SIMILAR CAUSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD POST OFFICE
BINTREE ROAD
BILLINGFORD
DEREHAM
NR20 4AJ
- Phone:
- 01362668220
- Email:
- didihunter@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window