KALLAR LODGE AMENITY FUND TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDED ADDITIONAL FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AT KALLAR AND FEWS LODGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
Governance
- 14 January 1983: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 October 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- BROCKELBANK LODGE AMENITY FUND TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85 | £345 | £348 | £338 | £149 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.38k | £35.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 23 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE AGED RESIDENTS OF KALLAR LODGE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE THE RESIDENTS AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF KALLAR LODGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window