Governing document JOINT COLLEGES NURSERY (CAMBRIDGE) LIMITED
Charity number: 286096

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 9 MARCH 1982, 8 JUNE 1992 AND 15 MARCH 1994 as amended on 03 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND CARRY ON A NURSERY SCHOOL AND CHILD CARE CENTRE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CAMBRIDGE WHERE CHILDREN MAY BE CARED FOR AND EDUCATED (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 1980)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CAMBRIDGE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.