Trustees JOINT COLLEGES NURSERY (CAMBRIDGE) LIMITED

Charity number: 286096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Joy Inns Chair 18 July 2023
None on record
Julia Catherine Lomer Trustee 03 March 2025
None on record
Yun Wang Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Bethany Hannah Grace Webb Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Lorenza Toffolon Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record