Trustees ACOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 286108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Steven Sherred Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
BARBARA INCHLEY MRS Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
RICHARD STEEL MR Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
DAVID ARTHUR HAYFIELD Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
WILLIAM JAMES YEOMAN Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record
KAREN AULT Trustee 12 January 2018
None on record
MS S BRANSFIELD Trustee
None on record
MRS I OSBORNE Trustee
None on record