JOY LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support and to enhance the education of the pupils at the school by fund raising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 18 January 1983: Standard registration
- JOY LANE COUNTY PRIMARY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- JOY LANE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Young | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florence Rose Marsh | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.75k | £11.90k | £0 | £14.33k | £13.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.35k | £11.85k | £3.66k | £24.54k | £9.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JULY 1982 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
CATCHEMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Joy Lane Primary School
Joy Lane
Whitstable
CT5 4LT
- Phone:
- 01227261430
- Email:
- friends@joylane.kent.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window