BARBADOS HOUSE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a Community Theatre and Arts Centre with provision of arts activities at the Centre and as Outreach within the local and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 June 1983: Standard registration
- 15 May 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 May 2020: Funds transferred to 1166858 THE PHOENIX THEATRE & ARTS CENTRE
- THE PHOENIX (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.94k | £213.23k | £191.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.82k | £201.40k | £185.42k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.32k | £37.37k | £40.95k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 April 2020 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
30 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
(A)FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FACILITIES TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, TO ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window