THE WESTBURY WILD LIFE PARK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a sanctuary for the maintenance, preservation and breeding of wild birds, animals, plants, insects or other wild life. Managing and restoring the parks natural and architectural features to facilitate conservation projects, educational activities and recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 January 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN PETER ASHBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Ashby | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ashby | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Silwal | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZAN MARGARET ASHBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE MARY BLYTH YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JAMES ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £9.93k | £23.29k | £24.82k | £57.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £6.92k | £22.04k | £27.88k | £60.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RECOGNISED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westbury Wildlife Park Foundation
Trym Road
BRISTOL
BRISTOL
BS9 3ET
- Phone:
- 07791444253
- Email:
- INFO@WWPF.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window