Financial history THE CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 286158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £121.38k £91.06k £104.42k £118.98k £99.41k
Total expenditure £112.83k £95.60k £91.52k £114.18k £131.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £98.05k £84.19k £88.60k £107.81k £94.72k