Trustees FRIENDS OF DANESBURY AND QUEEN VICTORIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Charity number: 286165

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Hawes | Chair | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jill Conium | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Fowler | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lee Oldham | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Ainscough | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Stowe | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOY WEARING | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES WHITWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA PAULINE OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.