Trustees THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE HOLIDAY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 286214

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Lee | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Goodbrand | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Beatrice Salmon | Trustee | 29 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gina Cathrine Holland | Trustee | 31 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Andrews | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA RUTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LYDIA HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.