Accounts and annual returns THE PHOENIX BEQUEST FOR DISABLED MUSICIANS

Charity Number: 286219
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 24 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 26 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 31 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 16 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 18 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required