FELIXSTOWE CARNIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOCAL VOLUNTEERS THAT ORGANISE AND PUT TOGETHER FELIXSTOWE CARNIVAL WEEKEND, WITH HELP FROM DONATIONS FROM LOCAL BUSINESSES. ANY PROFITS MADE AT THE END OF OUR FINANCIAL YEAR ARE THEN DISTRIBUTED TO OTHER LOCAL CHARITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 February 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Gooch | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PORTER | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ELIZABETH BELLAMY | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £5.14k | £2.49k | £38.93k | £36.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.88k | £5.62k | £3.03k | £30.44k | £39.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1982 as amended on 23 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FELIXSTOWE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION PROTECTING HEALTH RELIEVING POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED IN LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
FELIXSTOWE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Blue Barn Close
Trimley St. Martin
FELIXSTOWE
Suffolk
IP11 0YX
- Phone:
- 07793141753
- Email:
- sarahlgooch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window