Financial history LITTLE BRICKHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 286272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.89k £0 £4.82k £6.30k £6.88k
Total expenditure £6.09k £1.11k £4.25k £3.13k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A