FRIENDS OF PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOPHS raises funds to support a range of school projects, large and small to benefit girls throughout the school. It organises a wide range of social events and activities involving the whole school community - girls, teaching staff and parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 08 February 1985: Standard registration
- F O P H S (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Butter | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Holcroft | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allison Hall | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Pike | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liz Leicester | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Newton | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Suzanne Hilton | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Cash | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Nogaledo | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Stirling | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aicha Badarou | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Sharrock | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paola Lettieri | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Niven Hirst | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Lawrie | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Becky Glazier-Philip | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Caroline Wada | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angelina Harris | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Miller | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Robert | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE FEARON | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.52k | £40.73k | £20.76k | £88.32k | £61.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £29.35k | £24.88k | £26.19k | £55.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 20TH OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL
35-37 PUTNEY HILL
LONDON
SW15 6BH
- Phone:
- 07748 202621
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window