Trustees THE PATTENMAKERS COMPANY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 286312

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Edward Miller | Chair | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Hodge | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Michael John Packham | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
David Michael Watson Smith | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Sidney Balcombe | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Graham Derek Perry | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher David Stears | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID BARNETT EMANUEL | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachael Anne Scarr-Hall | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jane Wilson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
COMMODORE PATRICK JOHN TYRRELL | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Deputy Keith David Forbes Bottomley CC | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Alan Stewart Lyons | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Alan Kottler | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Alexandra Leijten | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MR ALASTAIR WATSON-GANDY | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Anne Bryant-Pearson | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Nicholas Charles George Andrews | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MICHAEL KEMSLEY FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.