IPSWICH ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ipswich Archaeological Trust was founded in October 1982 to inform the people of Ipswich of their archaeological past, involve them in the archaeological work taking place in the town and publicise that work. It also performs an advocacy role for archaeology and heritage services in Ipswich and Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 March 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHRISTOPHER ROBERT WILTSHIRE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH PLOUVIEZ | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abby Antrobus | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ANDREW LOADER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Keith Raymond Wade | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £817 | £486 | £335 | £422 | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £888 | £211 | £253 | £432 | £302 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE BOROUGH OF IPSWCH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF IPSWICH AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 Bourne Cottages
Bourne Hill
Wherstead
Ipswich
IP2 8NH
- Phone:
- 01473689364
- Email:
- keithwade999@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
IpswichAT.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window