Financial history DORSET DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £360 £821 £313 £392 £319
Total expenditure £301 £319 £311 £293 £319
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A