Financial history THE RACHEL FOWLER CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 286333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £11.96k £9.04k £8.98k £18.44k
Total expenditure £5.85k £3.99k £11.34k £10.11k £17.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.25k N/A N/A N/A