THE SURREY LAWN TENNIS ASSOCIATION JUNIOR TRUST

Charity number: 286344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sport and education for young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £162,734
Total expenditure: £33,080

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Thames
  • Lambeth
  • Merton
  • Richmond Upon Thames
  • Surrey
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEREK PAUL HOWORTH FCA Chair 09 December 1996
THE VERNON N ELY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ALYSON FOX Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
peter bradshaw Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £61.42k £25.04k £55.43k £60.57k £162.73k
Total expenditure £33.40k £15.10k £28.29k £33.08k £33.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 September 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 September 2023 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Surrey Tennis
Grapes House
79A High Street
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 9QA
Phone:
07971141316
Website:

No information available