THEYDON BOIS AND DISTRICT RURAL PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 286346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Environment/Conservation/Heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,025
Total expenditure: £918

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR P J NEWTON Chair
None on record
JIM WATTS Trustee
None on record
MR M V BOYLE Trustee
THEYDON BOIS VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.80k £60 £1.09k £223 £1.02k
Total expenditure £588 £1.56k £415 £944 £918
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 August 2024 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Elizabeth Drive
Theydon Bois
Epping
Epping
Essex
CM16 7LP
Phone:
01992813132