THORNEY HILL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes Grants for educationl purposes in connection with the Church of England in the Ecclesiatical Parish of Bransgore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 February 1983: Standard registration
- THE WISEMAN TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Rundell | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Watkins | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Pimenta | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.61k | £3.40k | £3.20k | £3.14k | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £1.63k | £750 | £12.10k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BRANSGORE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Ringwood Road
Bransgore
Christchurch
BH23 8JH
- Phone:
- 01425 672850
- Email:
- vicar@bransgoreandhinton.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window