THE AMERSHAM FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the society is to promote and educate the public in the art and science of music by the presentation of concerts in the area. We also try to encourage young musicians to further their studies by offering bursaries to young students studying music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Jenkin | Chair | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Cramer | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary McCann | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Kirkbride | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Mathieson | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine Susan Norton | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILL MINIKIN | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.74k | £7.01k | £47.46k | £59.27k | £71.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.36k | £9.50k | £58.96k | £72.25k | £84.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND THE GRANTING OF BURSARIES TO YOUNG MUSICIANS.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF AMERSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Whielden Street
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP7 0HU
- Phone:
- 07785320161
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window