Accounts and annual returns THE COACHMAKERS AND COACH HARNESS MAKERS CHARITABLE TRUST 1977

Charity number: 286521
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 October 2024 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 October 2024 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 July 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 12 July 2022 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window