THE SHELL-MEX AND B P PENSIONERS BENEVOLENCE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association is the relief of poverty among persons who are, or were, pensioners of the Shell-Mex and BP Group Contributory Pension Fund and the dependants of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 March 1983: Standard registration
- 18 December 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 December 2014: Funds transferred to 262049 THE SHELL PENSIONERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.67k | £18.90k | £95.99k | £22.70k | £27.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.91k | £81.57k | £71.19k | £74.14k | £70.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 07 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 08 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 15 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 11 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 11 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 03 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCITION IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE OR WERE PENSIONERS OF THE SHELL-MEX AND B.P. GROUP CONTRIBUTORY PENSION FUND AND THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window