BRIDGWATER YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A rural youth movement for young people aged 10-26 years. Members can gain valuable skills and confidence in public speaking competitions, sports, drama and entertainments, stockjudging and stock presentation. Members attend meetings and learn to fundraise for their clubs and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 13 June 1983: Standard registration
- 18 January 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 July 2016: Re-registered
- BRIDGWATER YFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Atyeo | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Champion | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beth Toogood | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Winters | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £11.95k | £15.71k | £8.42k | £420 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.96k | £12.34k | £17.64k | £11.27k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2(B) OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YFC OFFICE
THE OLD SHOOL
SCHOOL ROAD
WESTONZOYLAND
BRIDGWATER SOMERSET
TA7 0LN
- Phone:
- 01278691711
- Email:
- admin@somersetyfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window