WEST COAST CADETS DRUM AND BUGLE CORPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 16 March 1983: Standard registration
- 31 October 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PHOENIX DRUM AND BUGLE CORPS (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 18TH JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED 19TH FEBRUARY 1985 AND FURTHER AMENDED 15TH OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMET OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 21 YEARS IN THE ART AND MISIC AND TO DEVELOP THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC BY PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.