CHALONERS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants to people who have not attained the age of 25 years and are resident in the Parish of Braunton for financial assistence with providing books, tools etc to assist in their education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 18 March 1983: Standard registration
- CHALONER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Serret | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY DIBBLE | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SQUIRE | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SPEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY REED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WENSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROFF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.97k | £3.25k | £15.26k | £1.15k | £3.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £760 | £1.21k | £2.26k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE UNDER THE ENDOWED SCHOOLS ACT ON 24TH JUNE 1957
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BRAUNTON WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 12(1) OF SCHEME MADE ON 24TH JUNE 1957.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAUNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slee Blackwell Solicitors Llp
10 Cross Street
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1BA
- Phone:
- 01271349943
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window