THE SOCIETY FOR DANCE RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CHARITY SUPPORTS AND ADVANCES THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE ART OF DANCE IN ALL ITS FORMS, DISSEMINATING THE WORK OF NEW AND ESTABLISHED SCHOLARS VIA CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, DISCUSSIONS AND ARTS EVENTS. WE ARE COMMITTED TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF NETWORKS AND FRUITFUL COLLABORATION WITH LIKE-MINDED ORGANISATIONS AS A MEANS TO RESPOND TO INITIATIVES AND DIVERSITY IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 March 1983: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2011: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kathryn Stamp | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jade Ward | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kirsty Russell | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Camacho Acevedo | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Munro | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Johnstone | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Bethany Charlotte Burrage | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Kostic Cisneros | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandie Bourne | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Lee Davall | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sinibaldo De Rosa | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dorothy Jane Carr | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charlotte Waelde | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £7.44k | £8.02k | £7.92k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £8.94k | £8.65k | £10.23k | £7.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20TH FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE ART OF DANCE IN ALL ITS FORMS AND ASPECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Centre for Dance Research (C-DaRE)
Coventry University
Priory Street
COVENTRY
CV1 5FB
- Phone:
- +44 2476158364
- Email:
- kathryn.stamp@coventry.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window