LAWN (SWINDON) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the social welfare of all those living within our area of benefit. We manage Lawn Community Centre to further this aim. We endeavour to run it in an efficient way as cost effectively as possible. We organise social events in Lawn Community Centre and promote activities elsewhere in the neighbourhood. We support local groups when appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Swindon
Governance
- 28 March 1983: Standard registration
- LAWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Clayton | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wheeler | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Philippa Sundquist | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Gordon Fletcher | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Puttock | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ray Harper | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Saunders | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Parker | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
KRIS JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA GUYATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY FRANCES FISHLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.07k | £24.37k | £26.76k | £28.09k | £37.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.76k | £28.14k | £24.48k | £21.52k | £29.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £11.33k | £16.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 1996, AND AMENDED 31 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE BENEFIT IF THE RESIDENTS OF THE LAWN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), SUCH DEFINITION HAVING BEEN ESTABLISHED IN EARLIER CONSTITUTIONS BUT VARIABLE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES IN KEEPING WITH THE STRUCTURAL OR CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE LOCAL AREA. (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, IN COMMON EFFORT WITH THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION; (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES; (D) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE LAWN COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") IN FURTHERANCE OF THESES OBJECTS, HAVING OBTAINED A FORTY-YEAR LEASE FROM SWINDON BOROUGH COUNCIL IN 2014.
Area of benefit
LAWN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAWN COMMUNITY CENTRE
GUILDFORD AVENUE
SWINDON
SN3 1JL
- Phone:
- 01793651806
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window