ISLAND SAILING CLUB ROYAL WEDDING TRUST

Charity number: 286602
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training/Sport/Recreation of Children and Young People. Making grants to individuals (including loans)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 03 February 2014

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,507

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1983: Standard registration
  • 22 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROYAL WEDDING TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/02/2010 03/02/2011 03/02/2012 03/02/2013 03/02/2014
Total gross income £3 £2 £2 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £1.15k £1.20k £1.23k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 February 2014 20 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 03 February 2013 16 December 2013 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 03 February 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2012 Not Required
Annual return 03 February 2011 30 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2011 Not Required