BURY LAKE YOUNG MARINERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 May 1983: Standard registration
- 21 June 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 26 May 2005 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 26 May 2005 | 115 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 28TH JANUARY 1983
Charitable objects
(A) TO ORGANISE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO SAIL OR PLAY OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF THEIR MINDS. (B) TO ORGANISE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR BYS AND GIRLS UNDER THE AGE OF 24 YEARS AND WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES). (FOR FURTHER INFORMATION SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window