THE COMMUNITY OF ST FRANCIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of women living in community under vows of poverty, chastity and obedience. Our works include hospitality for retreats and other purposes, counselling, spiritual direction, preaching, leading quiet days, participation in missions and both voluntary and part-time paid work for other agencies. The pay supports the work of the community in out different houses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Southwark
- South Korea
Governance
- 04 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR BEVERLEY CSF | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SR LIZ CSF | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sr Joyce CSF | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SR CHRIS JAMES CSF | Trustee |
|
||||||
SR GINA CSF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SR MAUREEN CSF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SR SUE CSF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.84k | £371.02k | £198.03k | £558.55k | £262.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.68k | £174.61k | £180.78k | £196.20k | £179.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.95k | £7.09k | £1.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £206 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £502.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.89k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £101.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £94.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 1977 AND 27 JANUARY 2017 as amended on 03 Jun 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2000 as amended on 29 Jan 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
To build up a body of men and women who, accepting Christ as their Lord and Master, will seek to follow him in the way of renunciation and sacrifice as an act of witness and for the loving service of his brothers and sisters in the world.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 04 January 1993 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Yukon Way
Leicester
LE1 2AF
- Phone:
- 01162539158
- Email:
- bursarcsf@franciscans.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window