Governing document THE COMMUNITY OF ST FRANCIS
Charity number: 286615

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 1977 AND 27 JANUARY 2017 as amended on 03 Jun 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2000 as amended on 29 Jan 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
To build up a body of men and women who, accepting Christ as their Lord and Master, will seek to follow him in the way of renunciation and sacrifice as an act of witness and for the loving service of his brothers and sisters in the world.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.