THE HENLEY-ON-THAMES AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing weekly recordings on audio memory sticks from our local (weekly) newspaper for visually impaired and any people in the area who are unable to read for whatever reason.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 March 1983: Standard registration
- HENLEY-ON-THAMES TN (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Lesley Smewing | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Knights | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Case | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WALDEN | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN FAIRBROTHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN MARTIN WHITTAKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £4 | £2 | £472 | £693 | |
|
Total expenditure | £737 | £700 | £588 | £584 | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 April 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH FEBRUARY 1982
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
HENLEY ON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 Greys Road
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Oxfordshire
RG9 1QR
- Phone:
- 07759213413
- Email:
- janecase@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window