COLYTON LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Colyton Link is a self funding scheme which provides a transport service to medical and medical related appointments for the residents of Colyton and Colyford. A pool of volunteer drivers using their own vehicles transport the clients and receive payments for expenses incurred. Colyton Link also makes donations to local projects and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 25 April 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Lesley Benton | Chair | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger Marshall Moore | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Benton | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH LESLIE MILLS | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ALISON VICTORIA MILLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
WENDY CANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNIE MALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.83k | £1.85k | £2.64k | £5.06k | £4.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £2.89k | £3.67k | £4.10k | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH JANUARY 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE PARISH OF COLYTON, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH, THE RELIF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COLYTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Govers Meadow
COLYTON
Devon
EX24 6PG
- Phone:
- 01297552140
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window