WINCHESTER SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education and appreciation of the art and science of orchestral music in all its aspects by the presentation of public orchestral concerts and by other ways as the orchestra from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 December 1984: Standard registration
- THE WINCHESTER AMATEUR ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
david peter blunt | Chair | 03 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Miller | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily English | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Higgs | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Susan Burbidge | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER INNES | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ELVIN | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||
URSULA PUENTENER | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MORCOM | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | £645 | £13.62k | £21.61k | £21.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.02k | £2.25k | £15.23k | £26.01k | £21.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 16 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS AND BY OTHER WAYS AS THE ORCHESTRA FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Springdale
Sleepers Hill
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO22 4NE
- Phone:
- 07795482770
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
winchestersymphonyorchestra.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window