LONDON KALIBARI

Charity number: 286688
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As in the 'classification'. 1. Monday Yoga Class, Spirittual Talk and Luncheon Club. 2. Monthly get-together. 3. Friday Yoga classin the morning and Music class in the evening. 4. Dance class in the afternoon. 5. Other activities as and when organised. 6.Community function celebration

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Total income: £28,921
Total expenditure: £16,594

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. It works with commercial participators without an agreement in place.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 1983: Standard registration
  • 06 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 06 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1158269 LONDON KALIBARI
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £15.24k £5.18k £18.87k £32.90k £28.92k
Total expenditure £5.28k £1.02k £11.66k £15.99k £16.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 31 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 31 July 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 05 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 24 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 24 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 28 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required