Trustees NINFIELD VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL
Charity Number: 286695

Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SAMI GUARD | Chair | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Chaseley | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAYE CRITTELL | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Stockton | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Dawes | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Lister | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Steadman | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pete Holland | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CUNLIFFE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN HOLLAND | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT ELDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER COLLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.